MS HB1314 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 1-3-42, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Terms Describing Photo Identification That Is Legal In This State; To Create New Section 97-7-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Crime Of Counterfeiting, Fraud Or Misrepresentation In Relation To A Tribal Identification Card; To Amend Section 27-115-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Age To Buy A Lottery Ticket; To Amend Section 45-9-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity For A Concealed Carry License; To Amend Section 49-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity To Obtain A Hunting Or Fishing License; To Amend Section 63-21-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity Required For Scrap Sales; To Amend Section 67-3-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Proof Of Identity For Purchase Of Alcohol; To Amend Section 75-9-503, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity In Ucc Filing Statements; To Amend Section 75-24-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Personally Identifying Information That Can Be Compromised In A Security Breach; To Amend Section 75-67-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity For Pawnshop Transactions; To Amend Section 75-95-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity Required For Precious Item Resale; To Amend Section 93-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Age Required To Obtain A Marriage License; To Amend Section 93-29-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Factors To Determine Risk Of Abduction; To Amend Section 97-17-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity Required For Scrap Sales; To Amend Section 97-45-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Definition Of Personal Information In The Context Of Certain Computer Crimes; To Amend Section 45-35-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Dealing With Fraudulent Nondriver Identification Cards, To Make A Minor, Nonsubstantitive Change; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tribal identification cards; recognize as legal means of personal identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,Branning,McCaughn |
2020-06-23 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Tullos,Clark |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: JB To EL |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B;Elections |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |