MS HB1312 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Reenact Sections 73-7-1 Through 73-7-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The State Board Of Cosmetology And Prescribe Its Duties And Powers; To Amend Reenacted Section 73-7-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Amend The Definitions Of "cosmetology" And "esthetics" To Remove Persons Whose Practice Is Limited To Only Performing Makeup Artistry, Threading Or Applying Or Removing Eyelash Extensions From The Cosmetology Licensing Law; To Amend Reenacted Section 73-7-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Duplicate Repealer On The Statute Requiring The State Board Of Cosmetology To Conduct Student Examinations Instead Of Contracting With A Testing Service; To Amend Reenacted Section 73-7-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From The Cosmetology Licensure Law Persons Whose Practice Is Limited To Only Performing Makeup Artistry, Threading Or Applying Or Removing Eyelash Extensions; To Amend Section 73-7-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Those Reenacted Sections; To Amend Section 73-5-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt Persons Whose Practice Is Limited To Only Makeup Artistry, Threading Or Applying Or Removing Eyelash Extensions From Licensing Under The State Board Of Barber Examiners; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Cosmetology; extend repealer on.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09 Approved by Governor
2021-04-01SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-04-01HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-30SenateImmediate Release
2021-03-30SenateConference Report Adopted
2021-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2021-03-27HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-27SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-27HouseRecommitted For Further Conf
2021-03-26SenateRecommitted For Further Conf
2021-03-26SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2021-03-26SenateConference Report Adopted
2021-03-25SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-25HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-25SenateConferees Named Bryan,Wiggins,Parks
2021-03-22HouseConferees Named Boyd,Young,Tubb
2021-03-17HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-11SenateReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-11SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2021-03-09SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2021-03-09SenatePassed As Amended
2021-03-09SenateAmended
2021-02-24SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2021-02-11HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-10HousePassed
2021-02-10HouseCommittee Substitute Tabled
2021-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7371Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73711Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73712New CodeSee Bill Text
73713Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73714Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73715Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73716Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73717Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73718Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73719Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7372Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73721Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73723Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73725Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73727Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73729Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7373Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73731Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73733Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73735Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7375Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73763Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7377Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7379Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/history/HB/HB1312.xml
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1312IN.htm
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1312CS.htm
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1312PS.htm
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1312SG.htm
Amendmenthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/sam/HB1312_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/sam/HB1312_S_Subst_1_for_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0370059.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0640021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0810012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0830036.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0850039.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback