MS HB1307 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 24-45-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Purchaser Of Land At Any Tax Sale, Or The Holder Of The Legal Title Under Him By Descent Or Distribution, Shall Not Have Any Right Of Action To Challenge The Validity Of The Tax Sale; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land sold for nonpayment of ad valorem taxes; sale is voidable at option of owner if chancery clerk fails to send required notice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Approved by Governor
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-27SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-26HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-26SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Polk
2019-03-19HouseConferees Named Smith,Lamar,Barton
2019-03-18HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-14SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-13SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-15HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-13HouseAmended
2019-02-13HouseReconsidered
2019-02-07HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Barton, Smith, Lamar)
2019-02-06HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-06HouseAmended
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB1307.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1307IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1307CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1307PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1307SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB1307_H_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB1307_H_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_02.pdf
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB1307_H_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1307_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1307_S_Subst_1_for_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0300014.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0370003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0650002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0790056.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0790054.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback