MS HB1305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 73-34-16, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Registered Appraisal Management Companies From Requiring A Criminal Background Investigation As A Condition Of Employment; To Require That Registered Appraisal Management Companies Instead Accept A New License Or Renewal Issued By The Mississippi Real Estate Appraiser Licensing And Certification Board For The Purposes Of A Criminal Background Investigation; To Require That An Appraisal Management Company Be Responsible For The Cost Of An Additional Background Investigation If Completed For Its Own Purposes; To Bring Forward Sections 73-34-14, 73-34-27, 73-34-33, 73-34-35 And 73-34-109, Which Relate To Requirements And Qualifications Of Appraisal Management Companies, For The Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appraisal management companies; prohibit criminal background check as a condition of employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2018-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed |
2018-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-30 | House | DR - TSDP: JA To WD |
2018-01-23 | House | DR - TSDP: WD To JA |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Workforce Development;Judiciary A |