MS HB1301 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-73-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Modify The Directive Of The Office Of Workforce Development From Piloting A Career Coaching Program In Middle Schools And High Schools, To Implementing Such Program For The Long Term; To Authorize The Office To Provide All Career Coaches Access To A Secure End-to-end Platform That Enables Them To Use Advance Analytics For The Purpose Assisting Students To Develop Customized Career Pathways And Directly Connecting Students With Post-secondary And Employment Opportunities That Match Their Skills And Interests; To Provide What The Platform May Include; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Career coaching program; modify directive of Office of Workforce Development from piloting to implementing long term.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: EC To AP |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Economic and Workforce Development;Appropriations |
2023-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-01 | House | Amended |
2023-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Workforce Development |