MS HB1297 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $2,870,000.00 To Provide Matching Funds For Federal Funds For The Water Pollution Control Revolving Fund; To Amend Section 49-17-85, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Interest And Investment Earnings On Money In The Water Pollution Control Revolving Fund To Be Utilized To Pay Debt Service On The Bonds Authorized To Be Issued By This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds; authorize issuance for the Water Pollution Control Revolving Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19HouseTabled
2021-03-17SenateReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-16SenatePassed As Amended
2021-03-16SenateAmended
2021-03-11SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-03-09SenateReferred To Finance
2021-02-25HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-24HousePassed
2021-02-22HouseRead the Third Time
2021-02-19HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
491785Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback