MS HB1292 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-5-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Maximum Term Of Imprisonment In Jail For A Person Found Guilty Of A Social Host Violation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Social host; revise penalties for violations of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-30 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-30 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2016-03-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Drug Policy |