MS HB1287 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-1013, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase From $80.00 To $88.00 The Amount Offenders Pay In Order To Participate In The Intensive Supervision Program Of The Department Of Corrections; To Amend Sections 47-1-41, 47-1-47 And 99-19-20, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Uniform Credit Against Fines For Work Performed By A Convict And For Each Day Of Confinement; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Intensive supervision program; increase monthly program fee that offenders must pay to participate in.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 79 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 93 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 79 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 93 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-23 | Conferees Named Malone,Arinder,Lane | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Simmons,Jackson (11th),Chassaniol | |
2010-03-16 | Conferees Named Malone,Arinder,Thomas | |
2010-03-16 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Corrections | |
2010-02-15 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-02-10 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-02-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Amended | |
2010-01-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Corrections |