MS HB1283 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Entitled The "mississippi School Safety Act Of 2019"; To Amend Section 37-11-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require School Districts To Develop And Conduct An Active Shooter Drill Within The First 60 Days Of Each New School Semester For Students And Staff And To Require All School District Employees To Attend Civilian Response To Active Shooter Events (crase) Training Annually; To Amend Section 37-3-83, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The School Safety Grant Program Administered By The State Department Of Education Shall Include A Pilot Program To Implement A Developmentally Appropriate Social And Emotional Curriculum For Students In Grades K-5; To Require School Employees To Complete A Training Or Professional Development Course In Mental Health Every Two Years; To Amend Section 37-3-93, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Mississippi Office Of Homeland Security To Develop A Curriculum, Train And Certify Threat Assessment Officers; To Require Certified Threat Assessment Officers To Conduct Annual Inspections And Threat Assessment Of Each Public School In The State, Develop An Improvement Plan For Each School Inspected And Provide Reports Of Such Findings To Local Law Enforcement Agencies And The Local School Board Within Four Weeks Of Completion; To Bring Forward Section 37-3-89, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendments; To Amend Section 37-3-91, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand Student Access To Local Mental Health Resources Under The Regional Behavioral Management Program With The Development Of State Standardized Memorandum Of Understanding (mou) Between Community Mental Health Centers And Facilities And School Districts To Include Referral Protocols And To Train School Personnel To Conduct Initial Behavioral Health Screenings Of Students Who Experience Stress Or Are At Risk Of Harm; To Amend Section 37-3-82, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Additional State Funding Of School Resource Officers By The State Department Of Education Under The Mississippi Community Oriented Policing Services In Schools (mcops) Program; To Codify Section 95-15-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Department Of Education To Raise Statewide Awareness Regarding The "see Something Say Something Act" And Provide Immunity From Liability For Good Faith Reporting Of Suspicious Activity Or Behavior; To Amend Section 45-1-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Direct The Department Of Public Safety To Establish The Mississippi Analysis And Information Center (msaic Fusion Center) In The Office Of Homeland Security And To Employ Regional Analysts Dedicated To Statewide Social Media Intelligence Platform Threats And The Dissemination Of School Safety Information; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The "Mississippi School Safety Act of 2019"; enact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 78 N: 32 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29 Approved by Governor
2019-03-22SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-22HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-03-19HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Paden, Bennett, Roberson)
2019-03-19HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2019-03-14SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-14SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-03-13SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2019-03-12SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-12SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-03-04SenateDR - TSDP: ED To AP
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Education;Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-06HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-06HouseAmended
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB1283.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1283IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1283PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1283SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB1283_H_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB1283_H_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB1283_H_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1283_S_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1283_S_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1283_S_Amend_03.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0300034.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0640018.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0710006.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback