MS HB1281 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide That No Health Coverage Plan Shall Restrict Coverage For Prescribed Treatment Based Upon The Insured's Diagnosis With A Terminal Condition; To Provide That No Health Benefit Paid With State Funds Specifically Medicaid And The State Insurance Plan Shall Restrict Coverage For Physician Prescribed Treatment Based Upon The Individual's Diagnosis With A Terminal Condition; To Amend Section 25-15-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rights of individual's with a terminal condition; require payment of health insurance and Medicaid benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26 Approved by Governor
2014-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-17HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2014-03-13SenateReturned For Concurrence
2014-03-12SenatePassed As Amended
2014-03-12SenateAmended
2014-03-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2014-02-21SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2014-02-17HouseTransmitted To Senate
2014-02-12HousePassed As Amended
2014-02-12HouseAmended
2014-02-04HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-01-20HouseReferred To Insurance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback