MS HB1281 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create "the William Lee Montjoy" Pool Safety Act; To Provide The Definitions For Certain Locks And Gates; To Provide That The Provisions Of This Act Shall Only Apply To A Pool Owned, Controlled Or Maintained By The Owner Of A Multiunit Rental Complex, Property Owners Association, Private Club, And Doors And Windows Of Rental Dwellings Opening Into The Pool Yard Of A Multiunit Rental Complex Or Condominium, Cooperative, Or Townhome Project; To Provide That The Owner Of A Multiunit Rental Complex With A Pool Or A Property Owners Association That Owns, Controls Or Maintains A Pool Shall Completely Enclose The Pool Yard With A Pool Yard Enclosure; To Provide That A Door, Sliding Glass Door, Or French Door May Not Open Directly Into A Pool Yard If The Date Of Electrical Service For Initial Construction Of The Building Or Pool Is On Or After July 1, 2012; To Provide That A Tenant Of An Owner Of A Multiunit Rental Complex, A Member Of A Property Owners Association, A Governmental Entity, Or Any Other Person Or The Person's Representative May Maintain An Action Against The Owner Or Property Owners Association For Failure To Comply With The Requirements Of This Act; To Provide That The Owner Of A Multiunit Rental Complex Or A Property Owners Association Is Not Required To Enclose A Body Of Water Or Construct Barriers Between The Owner's Or Property Owners Association's Property And A Body Of Water Such As An Ocean, Bay, Lake, Pond, Bayou, River, Creek, Stream, Spring, Reservoir, Stock Tank, Culvert, Drainage Ditch, Detention Pond, Or Other Flood Or Drainage Facility; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pool enclosures; authorize municipalities to regulate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-19 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 107 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-24 Enrolled Bill Signed
2012-04-24 Enrolled Bill Signed
2012-04-19 Concurred in Amend From Senate
2012-04-19 Reconsidered
2012-04-18 Motion to Reconsider Entered (Baria, Blackmon, Myers)
2012-04-18 Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
2012-04-17 Returned For Concurrence
2012-04-12 Passed As Amended
2012-04-12 Amended
2012-04-12 Reconsidered
2012-04-09 Motion to Reconsider Entered
2012-04-05 Passed As Amended
2012-04-05 Amended
2012-04-03 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2012-03-22 Referred To Judiciary, Division B
2012-03-15 Transmitted To Senate
2012-03-13 Passed As Amended
2012-03-13 Amended
2012-03-13 Committee Substitute Adopted
2012-03-08 Tabled Subject To Call
2012-03-01 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2012-02-20 Referred To Municipalities

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback