MS HB1263 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require The Department Of Transportation, Certain Local Agencies And Railroads To Accommodate Each Other When A Public Improvement Project Conflicts With Railroad Operations Or Facilities; To Require A Public Entity Or Railroad To Issue Necessary Easements, Work Permits And Licenses Within 60 Days Of Engineering Data Submission; To Require Railroads And Public Entities To Comply With The Terms Of A Permit Unless 30 Days Notice Is Provided; To Provide Procedures For Seeking Relief Due To Delay Or Breach Of A Permit; To Amend Section 65-1-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public improvement projects; require certain governmental entities and railroads to accomodate each other when operations conflict with.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-23 | House | DR - TSDP: JA To TR |
2016-02-17 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To JA |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Transportation;Judiciary A |