MS HB1263 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-21-91, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Continuing Education Reporting Requirements For The Annual Renewal Of A License To Practice Pharmacy; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists; revise continuing education reporting requirements for licensure renewal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
2010-03-22 Veto Referred To Public Health and Human Services
2010-03-17 Vetoed
2010-03-16 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-03-15 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-03-11 Transmitted To House
2010-03-11 Motion to Reconsider Tabled
2010-03-10 Motion to Reconsider Entered
2010-03-10 Passed
2010-03-02 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-02-08 Referred To Public Health and Welfare
2010-02-05 Transmitted To Senate
2010-02-04 Passed
2010-01-26 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-01-18 Referred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback