MS HB1262 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 73-21-106, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Permitting Requirements For Nonresident Pharmacies That Deliver Prescription Drugs Into This State; To Require Those Pharmacies To Certify That They Understand Mississippi Pharmacy Laws And Regulations And Agree To Comply With Those Laws And Regulations And Any Other Laws That Apply To The Practice Of Pharmacy; To Require The Pharmacist-in-charge Of A Nonresident Pharmacy To Hold A Mississippi Pharmacist License, Be Licensed To Practice Pharmacy In The State Of Residence Of The Nonresident Pharmacy, And Be Current And In Good Standing With The Licensing Boards Of Both States; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nonresident pharmacies; clarify permitting requirements for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2010-02-08 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-04 | Amended | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |