MS HB1259 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Be Known As The Lonnie Smith Act; To Amend Section 97-5-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Elements Of The Offense Of Felonious Child Abuse; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child abuse; revise elements of felony offense of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-20 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2013-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-12 | House | Amended |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |