MS HB1246 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
Pending: Senate Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 29-5-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Amend The Definition Of "improvement Projects" To Allow For The Demolition Of Slum And Blighted Properties Located Within The Capitol Complex Improvement District; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capitol Complex Improvement District; authorize demolition of slum and blighted properties located within.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2021-02-11HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-10HousePassed
2021-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
295201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback