MS HB1229 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-104-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Charges For Services Between The Department Of Public Safety And Other State Agencies; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Public Safety; authorize charges for services with other state agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28SenateDied In Committee
2023-02-13SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2023-01-27HouseTransmitted To Senate
2023-01-26HousePassed
2023-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-01-16HouseReferred To Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27104203Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback