MS HB122 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-19-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The First Offender Restrictions For Misdemeanor Expungement; To Authorize Expungement For Up To Three Felony Convictions If 15 Years Or More Have Passed Since A Person's Last Felony Conviction; To Provide Restrictions For Such Expungement; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Expungement; authorize up to three felony convictions to be expunged after 15 years.
Sponsors
Rep. Jansen Owen [R] | Rep. Sonya Williams-Barnes [D] | Rep. Lataisha Jackson [D] | Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] |
Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 80 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2021-02-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-02-04 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Kinkade, Bain, Sanford) |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Amended |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |