MS HB1217 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration, Acting On Behalf Of The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning, To Donate To The City Of Columbus, Mississippi, Certain Real Property And Any Improvements Thereon Under The Possession And Control Of The Mississippi University For Women, Located In The City Of Columbus, Lowndes County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public university property; authorize DFA to donate certain property under possession and control of MUW to City of Columbus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-11 Approved by Governor
2011-03-08 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-03-08 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-03-03 Transmitted To House
2011-03-02 Passed
2011-02-24 Title Suff Do Pass
2011-02-08 Referred To Public Property
2011-02-07 Transmitted To Senate
2011-02-02 Passed As Amended
2011-02-02 Amended
2011-02-02 Committee Substitute Adopted
2011-01-25 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2011-01-17 Referred To Public Property

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback