MS HB1207 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Paramedics Recruitment And Retention Scholarship Grant Program; To Provide That The Program Shall Be Used By The Office Of Workforce Development, With The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security Acting As The Fiscal Agent, For The Purpose Of Providing Funding For Grants To Cover The Full Cost Of Tuition, Fees, Books And Any Required Uniforms For Qualified Applicants To Attend An Accredited Paramedic Program And To Reimburse The Cost Of A Qualified Applicant's Fee For The Successful Completion Of The National Registry Paramedic Cognitive And Psychomotor Examinations; To Provide How An Applicant May Qualify For A Grant; To Provide That The Recipient Of A Grant Shall Commit To Serving As A Paramedic For Three Continuous Years In The State; To Provide The Reporting Requirements; To Authorize The Office Of Workforce Development To Enter Into Moas With Local School Districts For The Purpose Of Allowing Certain High School Students To Enroll In Accredited Paramedic Training Programs Through Dual-credit Or Dual-enrollment; To Provide That Such Student Cannot Take The Certification Exam Until He Or She Attains 18 Years Of Age; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paramedics Recruitment and Retention Scholarship Grant Program; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28SenateDied In Committee
2023-02-14SenateReferred To Education;Appropriations
2023-02-09HouseTransmitted To Senate
2023-02-07HousePassed As Amended
2023-02-07HouseAmended
2023-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2023-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2023-01-31HouseDR - TSDPCS: AP To UC
2023-01-25HouseDR - TSDP: UC To AP
2023-01-16HouseReferred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback