MS HB1207 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-5-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Penalties For Certain Types Of Exploitation; To Amend Section 97-5-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Bring Forward Section 97-5-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Crime Of Computer Luring, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Penalties for electronic crimes by minors; clarify.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2022-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
97 | 5 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 5 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 5 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |