MS HB1206 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 49-7-31.4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Dates On Open Season For Fur-bearing Animals And Hunting Opossums, Racoons And Bobcats With Dogs And Guns; To Amend Section 49-7-31.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 526, 2024 Regular Session, To Clarify The Circumstances Under Which Hunters Must Wear Solid Unbroken Fluorescent Orange Or Solid Unbroken Fluorescent Pink; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open Season; revise dates for fur-bearing animals and hunting opossums, racoons and bobcats with dogs and guns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-15 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-23 Approved by Governor
2024-04-17SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2024-04-16HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2024-04-15HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2024-04-11SenateReturned For Concurrence
2024-04-09SenatePassed As Amended
2024-04-09SenateAmended
2024-03-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2024-03-18SenateReferred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
2024-03-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2024-03-13HousePassed
2024-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2024-02-14HouseReferred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
49731Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback