MS HB1205 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-9-351, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of "telemedicine" For Provisions Of Law Regarding Coverage Of Telemedicine Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Telemedicine; revise definition for provisions of law regarding coverage for telemedicine services.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Died In Conference |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Michel,Boyd,Kirby |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Zuber,Ford (54th),Turner |
2021-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2021-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the Third Time |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Insurance |