MS HB1205 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Be Known As The Dewayne Crenshaw Act; To Amend Section 41-29-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Cathinone Derivatives In Schedule I And To Clarify The Punishment For Offenses Involving Synthetic Cannabinoids; To Amend Section 41-29-139, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Punishment For Offenses Involving Synthetic Cannabinoids; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cathinone derivatives; include in Schedule I.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-11 Approved by Governor
2011-03-08 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-03-08 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-03-04 Transmitted To House
2011-03-03 Passed
2011-02-24 Title Suff Do Pass
2011-02-09 Referred To Drug Policy
2011-02-09 Transmitted To Senate
2011-02-07 Passed As Amended
2011-02-07 Amended
2011-02-07 Committee Substitute Adopted
2011-01-26 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2011-01-17 Referred To Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback