MS HB1185 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Any County To Contract With The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Perform Maintenance On The State Highways And Interstate Highways In That County And Any Rights-of-way To Such Highways; To Amend Section 65-1-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Enter Into Such A Contract; To Authorize The Mississippi Transportation Commission, Acting Through The Mississippi Department Of Transportation, To Sell Certain State-owned Real Property And Any Improvements Thereon, Which Are Located In Winston County, Mississippi, To The County Board Of Supervisors; To Authorize The Southern Rail Commission To Execute And Enter Into Contracts With Parties For The Purpose Of Construction Of Any Related Infrastructure And/or Operations Of Intercity Passenger Rail Service Subject To The Approval Of Any Affected Railroad And Other Interested Party; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State and Interstate highways; authorize Mississippi Transportation Commission and counties to contract for counties to maintain.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Branning,DeLano,Butler (36th) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Branning,Whaley,Butler (36th) |
2022-03-16 | House | Conferees Named Busby,Massengill,Byrd |
2022-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | DR - TSDP: HI To CA |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation;County Affairs |
2022-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-01 | House | DR - TSDP: CA To TR |
2022-01-26 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To CA |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Transportation;County Affairs |