MS HB1180 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 33-7-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Whenever Any Federally Recognized Officer Or Enlisted Member Of The Mississippi National Guard Is Unable To Maintain Federal Recognition, He Shall Be Placed On The Retired List Of The Mississippi National Guard; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi National Guard; revise conditions under which members will be placed on retired list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs |
2022-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed |
2022-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Military Affairs |