MS HB1160 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Dual Credit Community College Scholarship Program, Which Shall Consist Of The Academic Dual Credit Community College Scholarship Program And The Career And Technical Community College Scholarship Program; To Require The Mississippi Community College Board To Administer The Scholarship Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Dual Credit Community College Scholarship Program; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Manly Barton [R] | Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] | Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-02 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To UC |
2021-01-27 | House | DR - TSDP: UC To AP |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations |