MS HB1151 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 63-21-63 And 63-21-64, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Fees For Certificates Of Title For Motor Vehicles, Manufactured Homes And Mobile Homes; To Amend Section 63-21-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Amount Of The Title Fees Collected By The Department Of Revenue Shall Be Deposited Into A Special Fund In The State Treasury To The Credit Of The Department; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicle title fees; increase and deposit into Crisis Intervention Mental Health Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 86 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 86 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-22 | Conferees Named Kirby,Bryan,Albritton | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Stringer,Warren,Holland | |
2010-03-16 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-08 | Referred To Finance | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-02-03 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | Read the Third Time | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-27 | Rereferred To Appropriations | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Ways and Means |