MS HB1149 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require Each Circuit, Chancery And County Court In This State To Allow All Pleadings And Other Papers To Be Served, Filed, Signed Or Verified By Electronic Means In Conformity With The Mississippi Electronic Court System Procedures By July 1, 2021; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Electronic Court System; require all courts to utilize.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Judiciary, Division A |
2019-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |