MS HB1147 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 43-1-1, 43-1-2, 43-1-3, 43-1-5, And 43-27-20, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Automatic Repealers On Certain Statutes Relating To The Administration Of The Mississippi Department Of Human Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Human Services; extend repealers on certain sections relating to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-05 | Senate | DR - TSDP: PH To FI |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Finance |
2019-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |