MS HB1140 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That First-degree Murder Shall Be Applied When The Unlawful Distribution Of Any Substance Or Mixture Of Any Substance Described In Section 41-29-113, 41-29-115, 41-29-117, 41-29-119 Or 41-29-121 Is Proven To Be The Proximate Cause Of Death Of A Deceased Person With Certain Exceptions; To Bring Forward Section 97-3-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Amendment; To Bring Forward Sections 41-29-139, 41-29-141, 41-29-142, 41-29-143, 41-29-144 And 41-29-145, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide Penalties For Violation Of The Controlled Substances Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
First-degree murder; include unlawful distribution of controlled substances, when the distribution is proximate cause of death.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 78 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | Amended |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 29 | 139 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 141 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 142 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 143 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 144 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 145 | New Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 3 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 3 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |