MS HB1137 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-35-50, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Provisions Regarding Use Of An Income Capitalization Approach As A Criteria For The Calculation Of True Value For Land Used For Agricultural Purposes; To Provide That Government Payments And Crop Insurance Indemnities Shall Not Be Included In Determining The True Value Of Land Used For Agricultural Purposes And That A Charge For Crop Management Equal To Twenty-five Percent Of The Sum Of A Crop's Estimated Variable Cost, Machinery Ownership Cost, And General Farm Overhead Cost, Shall Be Deducted In Determining The True Value Of Such Land; To Provide That The Fact That Land Is Leased For Hunting Or Fishing Purposes Shall Not Preclude The Land From Being Deemed To Be Used For Agricultural Purposes; To Provide That Income Derived From A Hunting Or Fishing Lease May Be Used In Combination With Other Relevant Criteria To Determine The True Value Of Land; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; revise certain provisions regarding the determination of true value of land used for agricultural purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-25 | Senate | DR - TSDP: FI To AG |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance;Agriculture |
2021-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |