MS HB1135 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 17-17-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Terms "advanced Plastic Recycling," "depolymerization," "gasification," "pyrolysis," "solvolysis," "advanced Plastic Recycling Facility," "post-use Polymer" And "recovered Feedstock" For Purposes Relating To Solid Waste Disposal; To Bring Forward Sections 17-17-205 And 17-17-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Advanced plastic recycling; define terms relating to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Energy |
2022-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-09 | House | Amended |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-09 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 17 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 17 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 17 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |