MS HB1134 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 93-17-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Provisions That Regulate Out-of-state Adoptions; To Clarify The Eligibility Of Unmarried Or Separated Adults To Adopt; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Out-of-State Adoptions; clarify certain provisions regarding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Approved by Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-30SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-29HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-24SenateConferees Named Doty,Branning,Simmons (12th)
2020-06-23HouseConferees Named Cockerham,Reynolds,Beckett
2020-06-17HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-12SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-10SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-10SenateAmended
2020-05-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-05-11SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2020-03-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-11HousePassed
2020-03-03HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-17HouseReferred To Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB1134.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1134IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1134PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1134SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1134_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1134_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/0650017.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1560032.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1760005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1760013.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback