MS HB1128 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-17-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Fee For Court Ordered Home Studies; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Court ordered home study; revise fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2020-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed |
2020-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-03 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To JA |
2020-03-03 | House | DR - TSDP: JA To WM |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary A;Ways and Means |