MS HB1128 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-89-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend To July 1, 2024, The Authority Of The Department Of Revenue To Approve Applications For Certain Rebates Under The Mississippi Motion Picture Incentive Act; To Bring Forward Section 57-89-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Defines Certain Terms Under The Mississippi Motion Picture Incentive Act, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Motion Picture Incentive Act; extend authority of Department of Revenue to approve applications for certain rebates under.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |