MS HB1126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-33-729, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend Until July 1, 2021, The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Mississippi Home Corporation To Issue Bonds And Notes Annually In An Aggregate Principal Amount Not To Exceed $350,000,000.00; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Home Corporation; extend reverter on authority to issue a certain amount of bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Approved by Governor
2019-03-19SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-14HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2019-03-13SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-12SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-12SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-20SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-04HousePassed
2019-01-29HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback