MS HB1122 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 17-1-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Terms "agricultural Operation," "forestry Activity" And "traditional Farm Practices" For Purposes Of Local Land Use Regulations; To Amend Section 17-1-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Local Land Use Regulations Related To Certain Activities Shall Be Preempted By Regulations Promulgated By The Mississippi Department Of Environmental Quality, The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Commerce And The Mississippi Forestry Commission; To Amend Section 17-1-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Governing Authority Of A Municipality Or County Shall Not Restrict Or Prohibit Any Agricultural Operation, Forestry Activity Or Traditional Farm Practices Being Conducted On Land; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural operation activities; prohibit local governments from regulating.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-06HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2018-03-05SenateReturned For Concurrence
2018-02-28SenatePassed As Amended
2018-02-28SenateAmended
2018-02-26SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2018-02-09SenateReferred To Agriculture
2018-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-06HousePassed As Amended
2018-02-06HouseAmended
2018-02-06HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2018-01-23HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2018-01-15HouseReferred To Agriculture

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/history/HB/HB1122.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1122IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1122CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1122PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1122SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/ham/HB1122_H_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1122_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1122_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1122_S_Amend_02_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/house/0360014.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/senate/0580013.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/house/0640003.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback