MS HB1122 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 63-7-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Use Of Nitrous Oxide In Any Motor Vehicle Or Motorcycle Driven On The Streets Or Highways And To Prescribe Penalties For The Use Of Nitrous Oxide In Motor Vehicles Or Motorcycles Driven On The Streets Or Highways; To Create New Section 63-3-502, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Racing And To Make The Use Of Nitrous Oxide In A Motor Vehicle Or Motorcycle That Is Driven In A Race On The Streets Or Highways An Additional Offense; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; prohibit use of nitrous oxide in certain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Died On Calendar | |
2010-03-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B | |
2010-02-10 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-08 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-08 | Amended | |
2010-02-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Transportation |