MS HB1116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide That A Pupil Complies With The Residency Requirements Of A School District If The Pupil's Parent Is Transferred Or Is Pending Transfer To A Military Installation Within The State While On Active Military Duty Pursuant To An Official Military Order; To Require A Parent To Provide Proof Of Residence In The School District Within Ten Days After The Published Arrival Date Provided On Official Documentation; To Amend Section 37-15-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School enrollment; allow for children with documentation of a parent's pending military relocation to the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Education
2019-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-11HousePassed
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback