MS HB1115 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-21-609, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Authority Of Youth Court Regarding Durable Legal Custody; To Amend Section 43-21-613, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require All Dispositions And Modifications Of Durable Legal Custody To Be Reviewed By Youth Court; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Durable legal custody; clarify jurisdiction for.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-16 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27 Approved by Governor
2023-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-16HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2023-03-09SenateReturned For Concurrence
2023-03-08SenatePassed As Amended
2023-03-08SenateAmended
2023-02-23SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2023-02-13SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2023-02-10HouseTransmitted To Senate
2023-02-09HousePassed
2023-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-01-16HouseReferred To Judiciary A

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4321609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4321613Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback