MS HB1101 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-3-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For A Moratorium On The Application Of The Trip Optimizer System Requirements For Travel To Any State Agency; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Trip optimizer system; provide moratorium on the application of to state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Blackwell,Turner-Ford |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Beckett,Bounds |
2022-03-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Amended |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Appropriations |