MS HB1097 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-3-46, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The State Department Of Education To Provide Technical Assistance To Certain Schools Not Meeting Adequate Performance Of Accreditation Standards; To Amend Section 37-18-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Composition And The Qualifications Of Members Of Evaluation Teams Assigned To Schools At-risk And To Authorize Evaluation Teams To Conduct On-site Audits; To Prohibit School Districts From Hiring As A Consultant Any Education Administrator Whose Last Full-time Education Job In Mississippi, Within The Preceding Two Years, Was With A Failing School District; To Amend Sections 37-3-93, 37-7-301, 37-9-77, 37-11-18.1, 37-11-54 And 37-11-61, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Automatic Repealers On Those Statutes Relating To The Administration Of Public Education In Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Schools at risk; revise certain provisions relating to.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-16 | Conferees Named Carmichael,Watson,McDaniel | |
2010-03-16 | Conferees Named Brown,Broomfield,Straughter | |
2010-03-15 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-05 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-25 | DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Education;Appropriations | |
2010-02-15 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-29 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Education |