MS HB1093 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require The Joint Legislative Committee On Performance Evaluation And Expenditure Review (peer) To Conduct A Review Of The Effectiveness Of The Mississippi Development Authority's Effort Funded Through The Mississippi Development Authority Tourism Advertising Fund In 2024 And Every Four Years Thereafter; To Amend Section 57-1-64, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
PEER Committee; require to review effectiveness of the Mississippi Development Authority Tourism Advertising Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Tourism |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Tourism |