MS HB1089 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Partially Vetoed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Partially Vetoed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-104-371, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify And Correct Names And Purposes Of Certain Projects Funded From Disbursements From The 2022 Local Improvements Projects Fund; To Amend Section 37-101-83, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Purpose Of A Project For Mississippi Valley State University Funded From The 2022 Ihl Capital Improvements Fund; To Amend Section 1, Chapter 109, Laws Of 2022, To Revise The Appropriation Of Gulf Coast Restoration Funds To The Mississippi Development Authority For Fiscal Year 2023 To Revise The Use Of Funds To The Heritage Spring Water, Llc., And To Delete One Project; To Amend Section 5, Chapter 64, Laws Of 2022, To Revise The Authorized Headcount Numbers For The Division Of Medicaid For Permanent And Time-limited Positions; To Amend Section 9, Chapter 98, Laws Of 2022, To Revise The Purpose Of The Appropriation To The Workers' Compensation Commission; To Amend Section 57-1-16, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Monies Provided By The Legislature In The Ace Fund May Be Used To Reimburse Reasonable Actual And Necessary Costs Incurred By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Amend Section 57-1-701, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Monies Provided By The Legislature In The Mississippi Site Development Grant Fund May Be Used To Reimburse Reasonable Actual And Necessary Costs Incurred By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Amend Section 57-61-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Monies From The Proceeds Of Bonds And Provided By The Legislature In The Mississippi Business Investment Fund And The Mississippi Business Investment Sinking Fund May Be Used To Reimburse Reasonable Actual And Necessary Costs Incurred By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Amend Section 57-61-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Monies Provided By The Legislature In A Certain Fund Created In The Mississippi Business Act May Be Used To Reimburse Reasonable Actual And Necessary Costs Incurred By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Amend Section 65-4-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Monies Provided By The Legislature In The Economic Development Highway Fund May Be Used To Reimburse Reasonable Actual And Necessary Costs Incurred By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Amend Section 57-1-221, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Monies Provided By The Legislature In The Mississippi Industry Incentive Financing Revolving Fund May Be Used To Reimburse Reasonable Actual And Necessary Costs Incurred By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Amend Section 57-1-601, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Monies Provided By The Legislature In The Mississippi Main Street Investment Grant Fund May Be Used To Reimburse Reasonable Actual And Necessary Costs Incurred By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Amend Section 65-1-183, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Transportation To Transfer Funds From The 2022 Infrastructure Match Fund To The Department's Agency Support Fund Subject To Certain Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State budget; revise provisions of several FY 23 funds and authorize reimbursement of certain costs of MDA.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-21 | Partially Vetoed By Governor | |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,DeBar |
2023-03-16 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,Cockerham |
2023-03-08 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2023-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-02 | House | Passed |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 104 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 101 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 61 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 61 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 1 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 4 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |