MS HB1088 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Individual May Purchase Wine From A Winery And Have The Wine Purchased Shipped Into This State So Long As It Is Shipped To A Package Retailer Permittee In This State; To Provide That The Package Retailer Permittee Shall Pay To The Department Of Revenue All Taxes, Fees And Surcharges On The Wine That Are Imposed Upon The Sale Of Wine Shipped By The Department; To Amend Sections 67-1-43, 67-1-45 And 67-1-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; allow individuals to purchase wine from a winery and have the wine shipped to a package retailer in this state.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] | Rep. John Hines [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 96 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 96 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-18 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Doty,Carter |
2020-06-18 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |