MS HB1087 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Renounce Prohibition As The Policy Of This State As To The Possession Of Alcoholic Beverages; To Amend Sections 67-1-7, 67-1-9, 67-1-11, 67-1-14 And 67-1-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Amend Sections 67-3-7, 67-3-11 And 67-3-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Possession Of Beer, Light Spirit Product And Light Wine Throughout The State; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; revise policy of the state regarding prohibition of possession of.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-19 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |