MS HB1078 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 41-43-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That It Is Unlawful To Make A False Or Misleading Statement In A Material Respect In A Record That Is Used In An Action Or Proceeding Or Filed Under The Cemetery Law; To Amend Sections 41-43-31 And 41-43-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provision; To Create New Section 75-63-83, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That It Is Unlawful To Make A False Or Misleading Statement In A Material Respect In A Record That Is Used In An Action Or Proceeding Or Filed Under The Preneed Cemetery And Funeral Registration Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Perpetual care and preneed cemetery and funeral laws; unlawful to make false or misleading statements in records under.
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Zuber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2021-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 43 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 43 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |