MS HB1078 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact And Amend Sections 27-7-22.7 And 27-7-22.9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide An Income Tax Credit For Income Taxpayers That Use Port Facilities At State, County And Municipal Ports For The Export Of Cargo And Require The Mississippi Development Authority To Report Annually To The Legislature Regarding The Impact Of Such Tax Credit; To Reflect The Name Change Of The State Tax Commission To The Department Of Revenue; To Amend Section 4, Chapter 492, Laws Of 1994, As Last Amended By Section 3, Chapter 377, Laws Of 2012, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On Sections 27-7-22.7 And 27-7-22.9, Mississippi Code Of 1972; To Reenact And Amend Sections 27-7-22.25 And 27-7-22.26, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide An Income Tax Credit For Certain Taxpayers That Use The Airport Facilities At Public Airports For Certain Charges Paid By The Taxpayer On The Export Or Import Of Cargo And Require The Mississippi Development Authority To Report Annually To The Legislature Regarding The Impact Of The Tax Credit; To Reflect The Name Change Of The State Tax Commission To Department Of Revenue In Conformity With The Agency's Reorganization; To Amend Section 3, Chapter 442, Laws Of 2005, As Last Amended By Section 6, Chapter 377, Laws Of 2012, To Extend The Date Of Repeal Of Sections 27-7-22.25 And 27-7-22.26, Mississippi Code Of 1972; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; extend repealer on tax credit for certain charges for using certain port and airport facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2016-03-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Dixon, Formby, Boyd) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Revenue and Expenditure General Bills |