MS HB1077 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-15-46, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Licensing Of Vessels For Molluscan Shellfish Aquaculture Operations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Molluscan shellfish aquaculture operations; revise licensing of vessels used for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources |
2022-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Marine Resources |